Case Information: 33536 | |||
Short Caption: | KENNY VS. STATE, HUMAN RESOURCES | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A382131 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/15/1999 / Kaufman, Jerry | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/31/1998 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/31/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 98-00573 | |
01/07/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 99-00090 | |
01/07/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. | 99-00091 | |
01/13/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-00218 | |
01/15/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jerry J. Kaufman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
04/30/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a conditional settlement of this matter. | 99-03471 | |
04/30/1999 | Settlement Agreement | Filed Settlement Agreement. | 99-03472 | |
04/30/1999 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Judge & Supreme Court shall retain jurisdiction until March 3, 2000, by conditions of the settlement agreement or unless dismissed earlier. | 99-03473 | |
10/14/1999 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 99-09984 | |
10/22/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 99-10343 | |
11/08/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK | 99-10949 | |
11/08/1999 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |