judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: JASON M. HEAD

Case Information: 11-BG-0087
Short Caption:IN RE: JASON M. HEADClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN515-10Filed Date:01/28/2011

Opening Event Date:01/28/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentJason M. Head NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/28/2011DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with certified copies of orders of the Circuit Court of the City of Virginia Beach and the Virginia State Bar suspending respondent for 30 and 20 days respectively.
01/28/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a copy of a letter to respondent advising respondent of Bar Counsel's recommendation to the court that respondent be suspended on an interim basis pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), and copies of D.C. Bar R. XI, and Rules of the BPR.
02/09/2011ORDER Having received certified copies of order of the Circuit Court of the City of Virginia Beach and the Virginia State Bar Disciplinary Board suspending the above-named attorney for 30 and 20 days respectively, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be suspended from the practice of law for 50 days in the District of Columbia. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the court with the relevant portions of the record of the proceeding in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the of the required affidavit. (ETW)
03/18/2011STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline.
03/23/2011TMC - notice of reciprocal discipline - OTSC - statement of Bar Counsel - proposed order
03/23/2011STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline.
03/31/2011FiledSUSPENSION ORDERED that Jason M. Head, Esquire, is hereby suspended for a period of 50 days subject to the conditions imposed in Virginia. It is FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of reinstatement respondent's suspension will not begin to run until such time as he files an affidavit that fully complies with the requirements of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (GL,PR,FE)
04/14/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of non filing by respondent the required affidavit in compliance with D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14.
04/26/2011AFFIDAVIT of respondent