judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-4604
A-4604
04/01/1954
Application for Writ of Error
LUMBERMENS LLOYDS
ROY JONES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/24/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/26/1954Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/01/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
05/01/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/24/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/20/1954Opinion issued
05/26/1954Brief on the Merits
05/05/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/05/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/05/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/01/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/01/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/01/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lumbermens LloydsPetitioner
Roy Jones, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information