judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FOULIDIS VS. RAMPARTS, INC. C/W 33398

Case Information: 33537
Short Caption:FOULIDIS VS. RAMPARTS, INC. C/W 33398Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 33398 *, 33537Related Case(s): 33398
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A354494Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/13/1999 / Macnabb, MarySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/31/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
12/31/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00574
01/11/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00144
01/11/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: November 9, 1998. To Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook 99-00145
01/11/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Dixon & Truman-Check No. 8235.
01/13/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Mary Macnabb. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/15/1999MotionFiled Motion. 99-00358
02/16/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing. 99-01041
03/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. We hereby consolidate the above-entitled matters for all appellate purposes. We have received and considered appellant's submission. Since we have received and considered appellant's proper person submission we have also considered Dixon & Truman's unfiled reply. We grant the motion of Truman & Dixon to withdraw as appellan'ts counsel. Appellant shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, obtain counsel to represent her in these consolidated matters and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. New counsel will be expected to participate in the settlement conference. fn1 [The settlement judge has rescheduled the settlement conference for April 13, 1999.] Nos. 33398, 33537. 99-01450
04/16/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 7, 1999. 99-03006
07/08/1999Letter/IncomingReceived Proper Person Letter. (Nos. 33398 and 33537).
07/26/1999Letter/IncomingReceived Proper Person Letter. (Nos. 33398 and 33537).
08/09/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-07324
10/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due: Response due: 30 days from the date of this order. Nos. 33398, 33537. 99-09427
10/08/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Daniel F. Polsenberg respresenting appellant Filomeni Foulidis. 99-09726
11/03/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause Why Appeal Should Not Be Dismissed (nos. 33398 & 33537). 99-10752
02/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Because appellant has retained counsel and filed a response to the order to show cause, we decline to dismiss these appeals. The settlement judge has filed reports indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of these appeals. This court shall forthwith conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of these appeals. Court reporter Mary Beth Cook: 30 days from the date of this order to prepare and complete the transcripts. Appellant: 100 days from the date of this order to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 33398, 33537. 00-02188
04/10/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address (nos. 33398/33537). 00-05701
05/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On February 11, 2000, we directed court reporter Mary Beth Cook to prepare and file the transcripts requested by appellant in the amended transcript request form filed on December 14, 1998 in Docket No. 33398. The requested transcripts have not been filed. Court reporter Cook shall have 15 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the requested transcripts or a motion for an extension of time. Nos. 33398, 33537. Document No. 00-08384.
05/30/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (nos. 33398/33537) 00-09087
06/01/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before June 23, 2000. Nos. 33398, 33537.
06/12/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. (transcript-nos. 33398/33537). 00-10059
06/21/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Potential Settlement. (Nos. 33398 and 33537).
06/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall within 10 days from the date of this order serve upon court reporter Cook a copy of the amended transcript request form filed on December 14, 1998, in Docket No. 33398, and shall file proof of such service with this court. Court reporter Cook shall have 30 days from the date of service of the amended transcript request form to file and serve the requested transcripts, to file a motion for an extension of time to do so or to inform this court in writing why the requested transcripts cannot be prepared. No. 33398, 33537.
07/10/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. (nos. 33398/33537). 00-11745
07/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Because appellant has represented to this court that the parties have settled this appeal, and in view of appellant's filing of a certificate of no transcript request, we vacate those portions of our orders of February 11, 2000, May 19, 2000, and June 26, 2000, directing court reporter Cook to prepare and file transcripts in these consolidate appeals. Further, we vacate that portion of our order of June 26, 2000, directing appellant to file proof of service on court reporter Cook of a copy of the amended transcript request form filed on December 14, 1998, in Docket No. 33398. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the appropriate stipulation or moton for voluntary dismissal or to show cause why these consolidated appeals should not be dismissed as abandoned. Nos. 33398, 33537. Document No. 00-13168.
08/07/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. nos. 33398, 33537. Doc. No. 00-13606
08/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, these appeals are dismissed. The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. NRAP 42(b) (nos. 33398/33537).
08/24/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued (nos. 33398/33537).