judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

R & R RIG SERVICE, LLC v. UNIVERSAL DRILLING COMPANY, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company

Case Heading (S-11-0080)
Case Number:S-11-0080Case Docketed On:04/05/2011
Linked To: S-11-0079
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:R & R RIG SERVICE, LLC v. UNIVERSAL DRILLING COMPANY, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company
Full Title:R & R RIG SERVICE, LLC, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. UNIVERSAL DRILLING COMPANY, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantR & R Rig Service, LLCDavid B. Hooper
AppelleeUniversal Drilling Company, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability CompanyRaymond B. Hunkins
Amanda Hunkins Newton

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Fraud, Trial - Damages
Opinion Number:2012 WY 31
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/05/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/05/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/05/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant re docket fee, check was made out for $90.00, requested balance of $5.00. Will send immediatelyEventPhone CallFinal
04/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/07/2011Fees - Docket fee received, balance of fee dueFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/19/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/30/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/30/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Universal Drilling Company, LLCEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/14/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/15/2011Notice-Incoming - Errata to Universal Drilling Company, LLC's brief of Appellee Universal Drilling Company, LLCNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
07/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Errata to Universal Drilling Company, LLC's brief of appellee Universal Drilling Company, LLCEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant R & R Rig Service, LLCEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/19/2011Event - Phone Call. Received call from clerk of district court indicating that neither party had filed a designation of record. She will notify the court in writing.EventPhone CallFinal
07/20/2011Notice-Incoming - No designation of recordNotice-IncomingNo designation of recordFinal
07/20/2011Order - Sanction - designation of recordOrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
07/22/2011Fees - Sanctions received - designation, counsel for R & R Rig ServiceFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
07/25/2011Fees - Sanctions received - designationFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
08/08/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Depositions & Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/30/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Raymond B. Hunkins for Universal Drilling Company.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David B. Hooper for R&R Rig Service, Inc.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/26/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Raymond B. Hunkins for Universal Drilling; David B. Hooper for R&R Rig Service) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/26/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/01/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirmed in part, and reversed and remanded, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/19/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/19/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/19/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/19/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/22/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/20/2012ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal