judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TERRANCE POLAND v. THE ESTATE OF DEANNA BESS GEORGE and ELAINE NALEE, in her capacity as personal representative of the Estate of Deanna B. George, and as successor trustee of the Deanna Bess George Revocable Trust dated April 3, 2008

Case Heading (S-11-0087)
Case Number:S-11-0087Case Docketed On:04/08/2011
Linked To: S-11-0086
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:TERRANCE POLAND v. THE ESTATE OF DEANNA BESS GEORGE and ELAINE NALEE, in her capacity as personal representative of the Estate of Deanna B. George, and as successor trustee of the Deanna Bess George Revocable Trust dated April 3, 2008
Full Title:TERRANCE POLAND, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. THE ESTATE OF DEANNA BESS GEORGE and ELAINE NALEE, in her capacity as personal representative of the Estate of Deanna B. George, and as successor trustee of the Deanna Bess George Revocable Trust dated April 3, 2008, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTerrance PolandStuart S. Healy
AppelleeThe Estate of Deanna Bess GeorgeAnthony Todd Wendtland
AppelleeElaine NaleeAnthony Todd Wendtland

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Estates - Trusts
Opinion Number:2011 WY 157
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/08/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/08/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/08/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/18/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/20/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
06/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the Estate of Deanna Bess George and of the Deanna Bess George Revocable Trust Dated April 3, 2008 and Appellees' Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/01/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/01/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Anthony T. Wendtland for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/08/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes: Volumes I - II, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stuart S. Healy for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/17/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Stuart S. Healy for appellants; Anthony Todd Wendtland for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/17/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/17/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/05/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/05/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/07/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - record received in district court.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal