judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHARON C. MOORE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0116
Short Caption:SHARON C. MOORE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-18269-09Filed Date:02/01/2011

Opening Event Date:02/01/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/06/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSharon C MooreY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
02/01/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/22/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4 (b). (BY:ETW)
02/22/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
03/08/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
03/15/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS hereby DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY FILED... (GLPRFE) (rm)
03/15/2011DISMISSED
04/06/2011MANDATE ISSUED