Case Information: 33543 | |||
Short Caption: | PHENIX (RAYMOND) VS. STATE C/W 34063/34601 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 33543*, 34063 , 34601 | Related Case(s): | 33476 , 34063 , 34601 , 39467 , 39832 , 40730 , 42890 , 50410 , 66928 , 68061 , 68061-COA , 70554 , 70554-COA |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C107053 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/14/1999 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/04/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/04/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-00013 | |
01/19/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. [fn1]--The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court. Nos. 31667, 33292, 33315, 33354, 33392, 33508, 33540, 33541, 33543, 33544. | 99-00305 | |
05/14/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 5/12/99. | 99-03973 | |
05/14/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/17/1999 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 2 through 28. Mailed on 5/12/99. | 99-04000 | |
04/10/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. Order of Affirmance and Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED in Docket Nos. 33543 and 34063 and DISMISS the appeal in Docket No. 34601. fn26[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB. Nos. 33543/34063/34601. | 01-06180 | |
05/08/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-06296 | |
05/08/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/01/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 14, 2001. | 01-06296 |