judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF DEANNA BESS GEORGE, Deceased: TERRANCE POLAND v. ELAINE NALEE, Personal Representative of the Probate Estate of Deanna Bess George, Deceased

Case Heading (S-11-0086)
Case Number:S-11-0086Case Docketed On:04/08/2011
Linked To: S-11-0087
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF DEANNA BESS GEORGE, Deceased: TERRANCE POLAND v. ELAINE NALEE, Personal Representative of the Probate Estate of Deanna Bess George, Deceased
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF DEANNA BESS GEORGE, Deceased: TERRANCE POLAND, Appellant (Petitioner), v. ELAINE NALEE, Personal Representative of the Probate Estate of Deanna Bess George, Deceased, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTerrance PolandStuart S. Healy
AppelleeElaine NaleeAnthony Todd Wendtland

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Estates - Probate, Estates - Trusts, Estates - Wills
Opinion Number:2011 WY 157
Citation:265 P.3d 222

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/08/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/08/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/08/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/18/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/19/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/20/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
06/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the Estate of Deanna Bess George and of the Deanna Bess George Revocable Trust Dated April 3, 2008 and Appellees' Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/01/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/01/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Anthony T. Wendtland for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/08/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes: Volumes I - III, Original PapersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stuart S. Healy for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/17/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Stuart S. Healy for appellants; Anthony Todd Wendtland for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/17/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/17/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/05/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/05/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/07/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - record received in district court.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal